U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Welch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Transcript]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 03, 2019: [Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 16, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 07, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 01, 2019: [Certificate]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 24, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • July 24, 2019: [Reconsideration of Detention]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 10, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 10, 2019: [Detention]
  • June 10, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.