open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:19-10255
    Party Name:Lou Ann Pioli
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [1-Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [none]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?40577
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =