open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:19-10254
    Party Name:Heidi S. Short
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?40576
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =