open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00087-1
    Party Name:USA v. Melendez-Medina
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Admission Pro Hac Vice (Court Use Only)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?30508
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =