U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larivee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • May 01, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 28, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 11, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 11, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 11, 2021: [Proposed Witness List]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • November 09, 2021: [Jury Seating Arrangement (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Jury Selection]
  • November 08, 2021: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 19, 2021: [Proposed Jury Verdict Form]
  • October 19, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 07, 2021: [Exclude]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Attorney Substitution]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 15, 2021: [Exclude]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 01, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 28, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Set (Private - No NEF)]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 24, 2020: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 22, 2020: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • January 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Mail Returned]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.