U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Melendez-Medina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • August 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • August 08, 2022: [Supplemental Document(s)]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 11, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (Court Use Only)]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 27, 2019: [Detention]
  • June 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.