U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Searl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 13, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 20, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • May 19, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • May 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2022: [Document Unsealed]
  • May 09, 2022: [Probation Form 12 (Sealed - No NEF)]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 05, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • April 22, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 21, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • January 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Request for Writ]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 17, 2019: [Detention]
  • June 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 17, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.