U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2023: [Attorney Substitution]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 21, 2021: [Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Transcript]
  • June 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 28, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 18, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 05, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Competency Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 24, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sur-Reply to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Waiver (General)]
  • November 25, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 14, 2019: [Indictment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 19, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.