U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brochu
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal]
  • September 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 01, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Indictment]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 11, 2020: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • June 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 26, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Attorney Substitution]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 24, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 21, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • June 21, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • June 21, 2019: [Unseal Document (Court use only)]
  • June 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)]
  • June 20, 2019: [Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 20, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.