U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buckley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • November 13, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order Releasing Collateral]
  • October 08, 2020: [Return of Service Executed (non-summons)]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Abstract of Judgment]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2020: [Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • September 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 28, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Declaration of Publication (GOVT USE ONLY)]
  • March 10, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Return of Service Executed (non-summons)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • February 03, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Issuance of a Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • January 21, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 21, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 18, 2019: [Extension of Time]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2019: [Receipt for Passport]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 26, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.