U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 14, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • August 02, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea and Sentence]
  • July 28, 2021: [Supplemental Document(s)]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 02, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • August 12, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • August 11, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 30, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 28, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 21, 2020: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 03, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 22, 2020: [Reentry Drug Court Proceedings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 13, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2020: [Reentry Drug Court Proceedings]
  • January 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 06, 2020: [Refer to Drug Court]
  • January 06, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 06, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • January 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 20, 2019: [Refer to Drug Court]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 05, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • July 03, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 27, 2019: [Detention]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 27, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 26, 2019: [Unseal Case (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 26, 2019: [Detention]
  • June 26, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 26, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)]
  • June 26, 2019: [Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.