U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bona
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • August 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • August 02, 2021: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2021: [Release from Custody]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • July 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Document Unsealed]
  • July 22, 2021: [Probation Form 12 (Sealed - No NEF)]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • July 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 11, 2019: [Detention]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 27, 2019: [Unseal Case (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.