U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quinones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Probation Form 12B]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • June 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 16, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • June 05, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 14, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • December 02, 2019: [Exclude]
  • December 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 01, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 28, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.