U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hardy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • December 02, 2019: [Statement by Defendant re: Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 08, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 28, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.