U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Attorney Substitution]
  • October 18, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • July 20, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • January 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 09, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 11, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 09, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.