U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • September 24, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 15, 2021: [Supplemental Document(s)]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Supplemental Document(s)]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
  • July 15, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • March 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 01, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 09, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • January 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • December 22, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • December 22, 2020: [Statement by Defendant re: Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 22, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 21, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • December 18, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • December 18, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 18, 2020: [Statement by Defendant re: Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 11, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • December 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 10, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • December 04, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 18, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 16, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 21, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 20, 2020: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • August 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 19, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 18, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • August 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2020: [Response in Support of Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 28, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 20, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 17, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • July 17, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • July 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Strike]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2020: [Joinder]
  • June 22, 2020: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 22, 2020: [Suppress]
  • June 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Transmitted Index on Appeal]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • March 27, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • March 25, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 23, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Strike]
  • March 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • February 27, 2020: [Suppress]
  • February 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • February 25, 2020: [Return of Property/PreTrial]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 23, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • August 26, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 22, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 22, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • August 22, 2019: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 16, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 02, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • August 01, 2019: [Detention]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 23, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 23, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 22, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
  • July 22, 2019: [Vacate]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • July 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 16, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 08, 2019: [Detention]
  • July 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 08, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.