open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:19-10302
    Party Name:Gary A. Bessette,, Sr. and Sandra L. Bessette
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement Effective]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Closed]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice (Generic)]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Amended Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors (Amended)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Add Mediator]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?40624
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =