open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00118
    Party Name:Causey v. Walsh et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental Document(s)]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?30615
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =