U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wade
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Probation Form 12B]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • August 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • August 05, 2019: [Detention]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 31, 2019: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • July 31, 2019: [Indictment]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 11, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.