U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. St. Onge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Probation Form 35]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 27, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • March 26, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • March 20, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 11, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.