U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Supplemental Document(s)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 24, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Attorney Substitution]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • December 05, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • November 21, 2019: [Suppress]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 10, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.