U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2023: [Document Unsealed]
  • January 04, 2023: [Probation Form 12 (Sealed - No NEF)]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Memorandum re: Revocation of Supervised Release]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 21, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 11, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Probation Form 12B]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Probation Form 12B]
  • June 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 11, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 24, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2020: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • March 09, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • November 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 25, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • November 18, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 10, 2019: [Suppress]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 13, 2019: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • September 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • July 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.