U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luna et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 29, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • March 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 23, 2021: [Transcript]
  • March 18, 2021: [Supplemental Document(s)]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 03, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Transcript]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 31, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 31, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 24, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 24, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • July 21, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 21, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • July 16, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 15, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 15, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • July 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 26, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • November 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2019: [Information - Felony]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 24, 2019: [Information - Felony]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • August 30, 2019: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • August 05, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • July 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 29, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 29, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • July 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 29, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 26, 2019: [Detention]
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 25, 2019: [Indictment]
  • July 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.