U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lashley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 22, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 19, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 15, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 08, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 19, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.