U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coronel-Barros
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 30, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • September 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge (Misdemeanor)]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 18, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.