U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Louison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order Releasing Collateral]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 23, 2020: [Dismiss]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • September 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 08, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 08, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 02, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 01, 2020: [Indictment Unsealed]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • August 27, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 20, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • June 16, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 04, 2020: [Indictment]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Indictment]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 02, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 12, 2019: [Hearing]
  • November 10, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 28, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • October 28, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 05, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Receipt for Passport]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 29, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 23, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.