U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10317
  • Case Name: Kimberly Rivers and Raymond Rivers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [BNC - Final Decree]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [BNC - Order Appr Fnl Rpt and Acct]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Approving Final Report & Account]
January, 2023
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approving Final Report & Account]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay (fee) (including Stipulated Motions for Relief from Stay)]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
January, 2020
  • January 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • August 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice (Generic)]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • July 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Amended Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors (Amended)]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.