U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 04, 2021: [Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 15, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Probation Form 12B]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Probation Form 12B]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.