U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pineda-Nunez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order Releasing Collateral]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • December 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 28, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order Releasing Collateral]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • July 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 27, 2020: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 24, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 08, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 12, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 18, 2019: [Suppress]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 05, 2019: [Extension of Time]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 25, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.