U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Russell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • July 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 16, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • September 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.