U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gordon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [Probation Form 12]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 13, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 05, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.