U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 09, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • March 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 05, 2020: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • August 07, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 07, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 07, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.