U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10336
  • Case Name: Norma M Dashno
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Certificate of Completion of Plan Payments]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
November, 2020
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Letter]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [All Schedules and Statements]
  • August 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.