U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guillette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 10, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Court Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • April 14, 2022: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2021
  • June 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 03, 2021: [Pretrial Conference ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 18, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 14, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 14, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 25, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Suppress]
  • December 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Indictment]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 06, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: [Indictment]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 10, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2019: [Detention]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 13, 2019: [Request for Writ]
  • August 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.