U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Samuels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 28, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 19, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 26, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • August 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.