U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 11, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • November 25, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • October 10, 2019: [Release from Custody]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 13, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • August 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • August 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • August 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.