open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00141
    Party Name:Inn-One Home, LLC v. Colony Specialty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?30731
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =