open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00142
    Party Name:Ford v. Quorum Health Resources, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Direct Assignment]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?30739
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =