U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arseneault
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Registry Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • July 10, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 10, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • June 30, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 04, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • February 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 20, 2019: [Exclude]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • August 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.