U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mattiace
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 12, 2022: [Memorandum re: Revocation of Supervised Release]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • April 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 29, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • April 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Document Unsealed]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration of Detention]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • April 08, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration of Detention]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 25, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • March 21, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 24, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • January 16, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 26, 2019: [Exclude]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.