U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Armstead
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 19, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 27, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 23, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 19, 2019: [Information - Felony]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 16, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.