U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Van Hazinga et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 26, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 26, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 26, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 16, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 16, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 08, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • April 06, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 06, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2020: [Release from Custody]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 23, 2020: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • August 27, 2019: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2019: [Detention]
  • August 22, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.