U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 05, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 05, 2019: [Detention]
  • September 05, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.