U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stratton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Response]
  • March 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 29, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • September 04, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 18, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 18, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 18, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 15, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 14, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 02, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 31, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 25, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 29, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • October 29, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • August 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 27, 2019: [Detention]
  • August 27, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.