U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. George
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Supplemental Index Sent USCA]
  • December 01, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Transmitted Index on Appeal]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • October 06, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 07, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 02, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • March 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 21, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2020: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • August 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • August 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • June 04, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • June 03, 2020: [Exclude]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 08, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 29, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 28, 2020: [Suppress]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 02, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 05, 2019: [Indictment]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.