U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10380
  • Case Name: Allan L Sampson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
  • March 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Sell]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)]
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • December 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Employ (Application)]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Employ (Application)]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 13)]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Payment of Chapter 13 Installment Fee]
October, 2019
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • October 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [All Schedules and Statements]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Application)]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • September 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.