U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Snead et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
  • December 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 02, 2022: [Supplemental Document(s)]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Transcript]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 20, 2020: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • August 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 12, 2020: [Hearing]
  • August 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration of Detention]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • June 15, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 11, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 06, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • April 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 03, 2019: [Detention]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 24, 2019: [Request for Writ]
  • October 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • September 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2019: [Detention]
  • September 30, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 30, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • September 11, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.