U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGinn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order Releasing Collateral]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 17, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 17, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Receipt for Passport]
  • September 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 12, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • September 11, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.