open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00159
    Party Name:Rivera v. Berlin City's Vermont Remarketed Autos, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment/Acceptance of Service (Non-Summons and Complaint)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Evaluator Assigned]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Evaluator Selection Response]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time (general)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Potential Evaluators Letter Sent]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Certificate - Response to Request to Produce]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Certificate - Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Certificate - Answer to Interrogatories and Requests to Produce]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Certificate - Request to Produce]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Certificate - Interrogatories and Request to Produce]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Received from State Court]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?30812
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =