open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:19-10389
    Party Name:Sally L. Mattson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement Effective]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement - No Action Ntc]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:December 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Consent]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Waive Appearance at 341 Mtg]
    Date Published:November 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Order to Set Hearing]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Continued]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?40716
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =